Financial history CARDIFF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1155885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £766.94k £761.40k £876.11k £858.88k £995.69k
Total expenditure £593.99k £607.04k £685.92k £695.11k £806.62k
Income from government contracts £86.03k £95.00k £95.00k £95.00k £104.00k
Income from government grants £134.56k £109.83k £147.95k £275.87k £329.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £526.56k £469.73k £565.46k £668.55k £719.56k
Income - Other trading activities £1.96k £3.89k £4.86k £0 £300
Income - Charitable activities £86.03k £95.00k £95.00k £95.00k £104.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £152.39k £192.78k £210.79k £95.33k £171.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £593.99k £607.04k £685.92k £695.11k £806.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k £3.50k £3.50k £3.50k £3.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0