TEBBS SECOND CHANCES (TEBBS SC)

Charity number: 1156730
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.21k £59 £1.77k £1.22k £754
Total expenditure £5.57k £71.96k £16.51k £4.07k £3.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A