Governing document JOHN SYKES FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1156623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 10 APR 2014 AMENDED ON 02/10/2014 as amended on 05 Feb 2020 as amended on 26 Mar 2020 as amended on 25 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
To advance such charitable purposes for the community of Reading, Berkshire at the Trustees discretion.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
READING BOROUGH.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.