Financial history GO RUN FOR FUN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.17m £644.33k £1.18m £680.15k £500.00k
Total expenditure £713.69k £739.00k £1.03m £754.02k £321.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £859.95k £16.00k £650 £1.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £310.00k £628.33k £1.18m £679.15k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £739.00k £1.03m £75.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £713.69k £0 £0 £679.02k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A