Accounts and annual returns THE 100 PROJECT

Charity number: 1157420
Charity reporting is overdue by 620 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 255 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 255 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 620 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 620 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 November 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 November 2020 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window