Trustees EMMANUEL CHURCH (BRAMCOTE)
Charity number: 1157080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Martin Jenkins | Chair | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Atkin | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alec David Cobbett | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Clive John Hopkins | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JAMES KRUGER | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rich Adam | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WILLIAM DAVIES | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DAVID CARTER | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.