Accounts and annual returns BROOMLEY GRANGE

Charity number: 1157688
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 29 March 2023 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 29 March 2023 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 December 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 30 December 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 January 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 19 January 2021 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window