Choice Support

Charity number: 1156486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.02m £33.07m £29.60m £66.57m £63.78m
Total expenditure £32.90m £32.01m £29.39m £66.26m £63.54m
Income from government contracts £29.98m £28.37m £29.35m £59.82m £58.65m
Income from government grants £69.00k £608.00k N/A £550.00k £1.43m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.14m £602.00k £156.00k £171.00k £49.00k
Income - Other trading activities £97.00k £73.00k £37.00k £17.00k £29.00k
Income - Charitable activities £32.65m £32.33m £29.35m £65.29m £62.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £133.00k £69.00k £50.00k £120.00k £124.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £972.00k £1.47m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £32.79m £31.87m £29.24m £66.10m £63.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £108.00k £81.00k £100.00k £158.00k £40.00k
Expenditure - Governance £57.00k £3.00k £0 £185.00k £95.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.57k
Expenditure - Other £0 £66.00k £44.00k £0 £0