Choice Support

Charity number: 1156486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shubhangi Karmakar Trustee 20 October 2021
PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
Tim Coppard Trustee 31 July 2020 None on record
Alison Hume Trustee 31 July 2020
PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
Andrea Corbett Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Naz Asghar Trustee 31 March 2021
PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
Chester Manuel Trustee 01 May 2019
PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
Babatunde Adewopo Trustee 17 May 2019
PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
Chris Dorey Trustee 01 November 2017
PARTNERSHIP SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
OLIVER MILLS Chair 28 July 2016
THE BLUE RIVER PROJECT Received: On time
Peter Hasler Trustee 28 July 2016 None on record