Trustees THE ABASEEN FOUNDATION U.K.
Charity number: 1157009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AFZAL HUSSAIN | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Shahida Hanif | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Iqbal Sharif | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Owen | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robina Afzal | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Waddington | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ansell | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Le Mare | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BINGLEY | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOSEPH MCKEOWN | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
INAYAT MUNSHI | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARY LOWE | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HAFIZA SULEMAN | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK FERGUSON | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.