THE BARNES WALLIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.48k £1.24k £1.75k £4.02k £1.48k
Total expenditure £1.64k £2.10k £7.87k £2.53k £2.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A