Financial history RAMBAM SEPHARDI

Charity number: 1157540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £33.65k £64.88k £34.89k £62.21k £56.00k
Total expenditure £57.25k £63.61k £48.56k £47.58k £39.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A