Trustees The Arts Society Bury St Edmunds
Charity number: 1156720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert George Charles Williams | Chair | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Edmund Hawthorn | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Bygrave | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marguerite Rose | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Perkins | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maximilian Clay | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Margaret Varley | Trustee | 12 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Richard Leake | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.