SUPPORT THE CHARITY WORKER

Charity number: 1156509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 March 2019 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 March 2019 33 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download