Trustees FOUNDATION FOR INTEGRATED TRANSPORT
Charity number: 1156363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby Blume | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Griffin | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Frost | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Alexander Norton | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lush | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hopkinson | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Duncan Maclean Stewart | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FRANCIS WALEY JOSEPH OBE | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.