CAMP HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £22.72k £20.04k £27.97k £37.46k £24.31k
Total expenditure £25.24k £20.85k £22.63k £26.77k £12.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £21.71k