Trustees HEART OF TAMWORTH COMMUNITY PROJECT
Charity number: 1157449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Margaret Smith | Chair | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Gregory Daniel Empson | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Bolger | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Berry | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Verrona Woodley | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Raymond Charles | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Patrick Peaple | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL WHITE | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.