Trustees FARSLEY AND DISTRICT ART CLUB
Charity number: 504684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHNSON BENTLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pauline Davidson | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sparke | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Hopkins | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Johnson | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER MACKEY | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATE READMAN | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CORMACK | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN MITCHELL | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BOULTON | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE MYERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.