GRIMSARGH VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £44.39k £47.91k £48.97k £39.24k £32.49k
Total expenditure £38.91k £78.74k £33.94k £29.32k £16.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.50k