Financial history STREATHAM DROP-IN CENTRE FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES

Charity number: 1156824
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £77.38k £84.83k £77.27k £88.09k £74.53k
Total expenditure £70.52k £74.41k £87.06k £69.10k £79.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A