Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ELY CATHEDRAL CIO
Charity number: 1157705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ted Gifford | Chair | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Man | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Michael Brooker | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Peter Leonard Back | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev James Stewart Reveley | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Joyce Isabel Fenton | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Veronica Lewis CBE | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
SYLVIA FARMER | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Bishop | Trustee | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
THE VERY REVEREND MARK PHILIP JOHN BONNEY | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD OLIVER SETCHELL | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
HELEN ELIZABETH MERRICK | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JANE DAVIE | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.