Trustees CHRYSALIS YOUTH EMPOWERMENT NETWORK

Charity number: 1158392
Charity reporting is up to date (174 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Bale Chair 11 April 2021
None on record
Niall Geaney Trustee 28 February 2023
None on record
Dr Denise Taylor Trustee 15 January 2022
None on record
Christopher James Foster Trustee 17 May 2020
None on record
Dr Teil Chooi Oh Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record