DUNHOLME VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 504738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.62k £12.06k £12.30k £12.42k £11.24k
Total expenditure £18.32k £7.82k £17.61k £11.58k £12.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k