Financial history THE KINGS CENTRE SOUTHALL

Charity number: 1163083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £48.71k £54.77k £107.08k £51.65k £86.93k
Total expenditure £74.54k £126.59k £93.74k £56.20k £112.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £8.36k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.22k £47.93k £63.44k £45.14k £82.58k