EBENEZER EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1160857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £70.10k £77.30k £68.00k £82.59k £74.85k
Total expenditure £73.19k £64.16k £64.39k £63.26k £74.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A