Trustees TRAWDEN FOREST COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1158193

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Ann Catterall | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jane Swann | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Webber | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM GREGORY PATE | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin McNulty | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Boocock | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Carroll | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Boocock | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Hodkinson | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Barritt | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Whitaker - Webb | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH KAY BERRIDGE | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Askew | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.