SUNBEAMS LONDON LTD

Charity number: 1158753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £51.76k £58.92k £82.98k £77.47k £101.05k
Total expenditure £50.96k £51.16k £78.11k £76.21k £88.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.17k £5.00k £23.76k £20.40k £23.18k