THE KINGFISHER TRUST 2014

Charity number: 1159152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £50 £116.15k £150.46k £188.03k £210.92k
Total expenditure £0 £161.32k £173.91k £185.01k £196.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £35.33k £32.84k £37.95k £42.89k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A