Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CANNOCK AND HUNTINGTON

Charity number: 1157373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Louise Brownhill Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
WENDY ELIZABETH BISHOP Trustee 20 March 2022
FOUNTAINS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Received: 12 days late
Rev Marie Tracey Meredith Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Teresa Bernadette Atherton Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Martin John Beavon Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Patricia Anne Archer Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Sophie Victoria Mcfie-Hyland Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Linda Dawn Hopley Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Andrew Paul Brittle Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Rev Victoria Rosalie Fleming Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Margaret Warford Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Janet Mary Bolton Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Rev Gillian Marion Joynson Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Clare Patricia Beavon Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
JOHN WHATMOUGH SKURR Trustee 18 January 2022
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS
Recently registered
DIANE ALICIA HOLT Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
DEBORAH BROWN Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
MR D GETHIN Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Janice Middleton Trustee 20 September 2016
None on record
DAVID JOHN WHEATLEY Trustee 20 September 2016
None on record