Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S GILLINGHAM, DORSET
Charity number: 1158272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Greenwood | Chair | 02 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sanger | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Cowell | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JEREMY GIDDINGS | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Light | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Teresa Goatham | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LONG | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Meriol Jennifer Lesley Cottrell | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Denise Snook | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eve Pegler | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Kate Wickson | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILLIAM JEFFS IRRV | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.