FYLDE COAST SCITT LIMITED

Charity number: 1158621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £419.19k £306.23k £645.76k £625.19k £401.75k
Total expenditure £410.63k £263.23k £567.89k £633.30k £415.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £382.37k £263.46k £463.80k £302.57k £53.15k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £645.76k £625.19k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £567.89k £633.30k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A