Trustees TOTTON SOUTH U3A

Charity number: 1157901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Jacqueline Roberts Trustee 13 August 2021
None on record
John Christian Kuyser Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Helen Margaret Creighton Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
ARTHUR JOHN BREACH Trustee 18 May 2018
None on record
SHEILA WEBB Trustee 14 July 2017
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN COPP Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record