Trustees CUMBRIA FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS - SOUTHERN DISTRICT
Charity number: 504833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIUSAUDH MCMASTER | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEN COOPER | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Lucy Dickinson | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
JENNY WOOD | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
CHLOE DAWSON | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|||||
GEORGIA HUNTER | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|||||
STEVEN HODGSON | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
CHRIS CALDER | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
REBECCA DENNEY | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
BROGAN JACKSON | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jack Fisher | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN HANDLEY | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ELLIE BURROW | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ROGERSON | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
JADE PEARSON | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
SHAUN HALL | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
JAMES CASSON | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
REBECCA BALMER | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WOOF | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
MELISSA HARTLEY | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Bradley Troughton | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
HAYLEY SIMPSON | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.