Trustees THE CUMBRIA FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity number: 504834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
54 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Dickinson | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
CHLOE DAWSON | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|||||
GEORGIA HUNTER | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|||||
ELLA BATEY | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|||||
ABIGAIL GRAHAM | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNY WOOD | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
William Longmire | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE WILSON | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURA PALMER | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SYDNEY SIMPSON | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
BRADLEY MCMANUS | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucy Winter | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN STORY | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
EMMA BLAYLOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
KATIE MAUGHAN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
AMBER RIDDICK | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jack Jenkinson | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
LAURA FOWLER | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
STEVEN HODGSON | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jack Fisher | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
BROGAN JACKSON | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
CHRIS CALDER | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
REBECCA DENNEY | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|||||
LEE MITCHINSON | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Dodd | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|||||
RACHEL ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW FEARON | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
RICHARD GRAHAM | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN HANDLEY | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ELLIE BURROW | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JAMIE LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOLLY STEADMAN | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JADE HAUGHAN | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
CHLOE BROUGH | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ISAAC COLLINS | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ELLIE NAYLOR | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ROSIE PRATT | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
TOM KIRK | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ABIGAIL FISHER | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ROGERSON | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
JADE PEARSON | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
SHAUN HALL | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
JAMES CASSON | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
REBECCA PALMER | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMY BLAMIRE | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOSIE MITCHINSON | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
KATIE FOSTER | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
MEGAN HARRISON | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN WOOF | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
MELISSA HARTLEY | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
LIUSAIDH MCMASTER | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Troughton | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
BEN COOPER | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
HAYLEY SIMPSON | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.