Trustees BOTLEY MARKET HALL
Charity number: 1158635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen paul Harris | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Law | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Jane Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Buckley | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Little Kingston | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ALISON NIMMO | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA CHAMPION | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
June Edwards | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM FRANCIS FREEMANTLE | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|||||
PAULINE FRANCES BOWER | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Freemantle | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WILLIAM OSWALD | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILSON NIMMO | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.