FELIXSTOWE OLD PEOPLES WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.07k £17.62k £29.26k £28.42k £35.22k
Total expenditure £41.15k £18.07k £25.78k £20.13k £6.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.50k N/A N/A £20.00k