Accounts and annual returns Earth to Ocean

Charity number: 1157931
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window