Trustees Chester Community Orchestra
Charity number: 1161941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY STANLEY MA MBA | Chair | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Patricia Brennan | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Roberts | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
iris weaver B.Ed | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Richard Landon | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Sanderson Oultram | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ward | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
P A TOFT | Trustee | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.