Financial history ANIMAL CONCERN CUMBRIA

Charity number: 1161354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £83.58k £347.76k £81.66k £1.25m £871.84k
Total expenditure £164.86k £144.13k £169.96k £188.01k £152.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.28k £1.25k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.24m £868.79k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £3.47k £2.40k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £4.60k £2.06k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.17m £847.89k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £154.78k £147.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £20.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £33.23k £5.40k