THE ARCHBISHOP RICE JONES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1158005
Charity reporting is overdue by 965 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 19 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 February 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 02 March 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 13 July 2016 On time Download