BETTY PHILLIPS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1158964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £96.83k £100.71k £101.59k £115.11k £91.10k
Total expenditure £63.81k £109.44k £85.33k £101.07k £103.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A