TASLEEM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1158786
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/07/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £26.81k £44.50k £30.47k £30.96k £29.97k
Total expenditure £20.86k £36.45k £25.36k £26.76k £24.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A