AFTER SCHOOL CARE (RICHMOND)

Charity number: 1157917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £37.16k £48.91k £60.98k £47.74k £51.13k
Total expenditure £40.93k £44.24k £51.19k £63.71k £53.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A