Financial history ST JUST AND ST MAWES HERITAGE GROUP

Charity number: 1158544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022
Total gross income £1.47k £12.72k £2.46k £2.28k £2.57k
Total expenditure £6.45k £17.53k £17.70k £37.71k £2.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A