Financial history THE LIBERAL JEWISH SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1159292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £1.83m £2.71m £2.05m £2.10m £2.00m
Total expenditure £1.80m £2.03m £1.93m £1.84m £1.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £948.06k £1.83m £1.34m £1.40m £1.15m
Income - Other trading activities £2.30k £5.15k £0 £31.08k £0
Income - Charitable activities £781.40k £715.13k £566.53k £568.09k £684.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £292.76k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £95.71k £163.36k £145.69k £89.46k £172.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.66k £3.89k £2.70k
Income - Legacies £38.40k £365.00k £70.50k £302.03k £20.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.80m £2.03m £1.92m £1.84m £1.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £15.42k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.81k £88.97k £10.71k £24.99k £26.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £15.42k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0