Trustees YEOVIL AND BLACKMORE VALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1158290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Linda Francis | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Elizabeth Cook | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Parsons | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE JAMES | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Soon Cheol Choi | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Fordham MAEarlyYrs | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Farquharson | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judy Turner-Smith BA MA DPS | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pearl E M Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Faris | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bathurst | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fraser Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kate Elizabeth Konrad | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda WALTERS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Robert Glyn JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY PHILIP GARDNER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET AURELIA ENGLISH B Ed | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
HAYDEN CHARLES WILLIAMS ACA | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Denise Binks | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JOY AYLEN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN COLE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin FARRANT B Sc,MB,BS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROGER WOOLDRIDGE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARGARET ANN OXENHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV CHRISTINA LE MOIGNAN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Joy Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET MANN WALSHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH UPSHALL BA HONS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY RUTH JONES BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ALLAN WATSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN WHITFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Philip Harrison Butler | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.