Trustees MENCAP MON
Charity number: 505013
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOT GALLAGHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dawn Edwards | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Zoe Tattersall | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Eaton | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Eaton | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charity Mapuranga Hughes | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Moira Tait | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE YOUNG | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET JONES | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MICHELLE MACKAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN BATES WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JON GRAHAM PEERS WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ANN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.