CHARLOTTE ANTONIA SULIVAN CHARITY

Charity number: 1158311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £87.46k £116.64k £154.23k £155.21k £106.37k
Total expenditure £127.72k £115.64k £128.18k £134.12k £108.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A