Trustees OXFORD CITY SINGERS
Charity number: 1161103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christian Gilliam | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joel Phipps | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee Chambers | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristin Lilja Linnet | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Natalie Cochrane | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wendy Hargreaves | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARSHALL | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|||||
OLIVIA GIGG | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARTYN ANTHONY GIGG PHD | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.