Financial history THE ALBACORE GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £90.03k £78.27k £89.69k £187.11k £30.51k
Total expenditure £100.76k £91.97k £97.90k £191.62k £43.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A